Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Balthasar Maria Remondini

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalonia e Zante


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1698BornBassano
28 Sep 172123.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Oct 172123.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 173637.5AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
19 Mar 173637.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
5 Oct 177779.1DiedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece

MicroData Summary for Balthasar Maria Remondini:
Bishop Balthasar Maria Remondini (born , died ) Bishop of Cefalonia e Zante

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 159
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1736, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015