Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domingo Pantaleón Álvarez de Abreu

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1683BornSanta Cruz de Tenerife, Spain
15 Jan 173854.4SelectedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
3 Mar 173854.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
17 Aug 173855.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
14 Mar 174359.6SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
20 May 174359.8ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
28 Nov 176380.3DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

MicroData Summary for Domingo Pantaleón Álvarez de Abreu:
Archbishop Domingo Pantaleón Álvarez de Abreu (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,598
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 199, and Page 409
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 56, Number 251
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015