Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso de Fuenmayor

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1502BornCalahorra, Spain
27 Oct 153836.8AppointedBishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
Mar 1539²37.2Ordained BishopBishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
12 Feb 154644.1AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
1 Mar 155452.2DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Fuenmayor:
Archbishop Alfonso de Fuenmayor (died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,050
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 51, Number 271
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 187

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Nov 2013