Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Faustino Burgos Brisman, C.M.

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Titular Bishop of Bararus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1960 Born
1982²21.8EnteredMember of Congregation of the Mission
30 May 198727.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
22 Jul 201757.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
22 Jul 201757.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bararus
26 Aug 201757.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bararus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Faustino Burgos Brisman
Father Faustino Burgos Brisman C.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Francisco de Macorís, Diocese of San Francisco de Macorís
Ordained PriestSanta Ana, Cathedral, San Francisco de Macorís, Diocese of San Francisco de Macorís
Ordained BishopCentro de Convenciones Sansoucí, Santo Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Santo Domingo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jul 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 22 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jul 2017