Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Tomás Morel Diplán

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic

Titular Bishop of Buxentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1969 Born
21 Jun 200030.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
14 Dec 201647.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
14 Dec 201647.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Buxentum
25 Feb 201747.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buxentum

MicroData Summary for Carlos Tomás Morel Diplán
Bishop Carlos Tomás Morel Diplán (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de los Caballeros

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLicey al Medio
Ordained BishopPontificia Universidad Católica Madre y Maestra, Santiago de los Caballeros, Archdiocese of Santiago de los Caballeros

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de los Caballeros.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 20 Dec 2016
  • c1+: CB, 25 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Feb 2017