Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Cedano Cedano

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Titular Bishop of Vita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1936Born
2 Jul 196731.4Ordained PriestPriest of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic
31 May 199660.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
31 May 199660.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vita
6 Jul 199660.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vita
31 Oct 201377.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
19 Nov 201882.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Pablo Cedano Cedano
Bishop Pablo Cedano Cedano (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantana
Ordained PriestHigüey, Diocese of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey
Ordained BishopSanta María de la Encarnación, Cathedral Basilica, Santo Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,770
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2013
  • d: CB, 19 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 20 Nov 2018

Quantcast