Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Garcia de Padilla, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Nov 1504AppointedBishop of Bayuna, Dominican Republic
13 Aug 1511AppointedBishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
2 May 1512Ordained BishopBishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
1515DiedBishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Francisco Garcia de Padilla
Bishop Francisco Garcia de Padilla O.F.M. Obs. (died 1515) Bishop of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Burgos, Diocese of Burgos, Spain
Death PlaceGetafe

  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,090
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,047
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 243, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 187
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1512, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 20 May 2018

Quantcast