Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro de Solier y Vargas, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹BornBarajas, Spain
17 Nov 161441.9AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
1616²43.0Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
16 Dec 161947.0AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
9 Jul 162047.5DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Solier y Vargas:
Archbishop Pedro de Solier y Vargas O.S.A. (died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 176, and Page 286
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 132, Number 843
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Number 18,212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Aug 2014