Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Granada

Archidioecesis Granatensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 December 1492
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Spain
  • Square Kilometers: 6,945 (2,682 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisgranada.es/
  • Mailing Address: Plaza Alonso Cano 1, 18001 Granada, Espana
  • Telephone: 958.21.63.23
  • Fax: 958.22.97.25

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Ilurir (Eliberi, Elvira, Granada)
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Ilurir (Eliberi, Elvira, Granada) (erected)
1150LostDiocese of Ilurir (Eliberi, Elvira, Granada)
Titular See of Granada
1437EstablishedTitular See of Granada
Archdiocese of Granada
10 December 1492ElevatedTitular See of Granada Archdiocese of Granada
19 January 1953Territory LostArchdiocese of Granada (Canjáyar and Río de Almería along with Canjáyar, Ohanes, Almócita, Beires, Padules, Ragol, Distinción, Bentarique, Illar, Terque, Huécija, Alicún, Alhama de Almería, Alhabia, Alsodux, Santa Cruz de Márchena, Alboloduy, and Nacimiento) Diocese of Almería
10 July 1957Territory LostDiocese of Cartagena (en España) (Euercal-Overa)
Archdiocese of Granada (Berja and Laujar)
Diocese of Guadix (Piñara, Alba, Abrucena, Doña María, Escullar, and Ocaña)
Diocese of Almería
10 July 1957Territory AddedDiocese of Málaga (Zaf arraya, Almendral, and Ventas de Zafarraya) Archdiocese of Granada

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Granada
1950680,000682,00099.7%323984211,6152581,440254ap1951
1970620,000620,34299.9%3372405771,0745451,668234ap1971
1980631,000638,80098.8%2311984291,4704551,902258ap1981
1990640,000673,00095.1%2631704331,4781318966257ap1991
1999660,500694,26995.1%2671824491,47123041,402264ap2000
2000661,000693,90095.3%2731804531,45922951,410264ap2001
2001674,828693,90097.3%2771804571,47612911,420264ap2002
2002674,828693,90097.3%2791924711,43213531,623264ap2003
2003675,115693,90097.3%2851434281,57712751,610265ap2004
2004679,845706,89696.2%2781404181,62612171,259266ap2005
2006743,530860,89886.4%2821364181,77812561,265267ap2007
2013785,200794,30098.9%264743382,3232141566267ap2014
2016806,500822,07198.1%2581694271,88822351,497267ap2017
2019795,470812,19697.9%2502204701,6922266962266ap2020
2021796,450813,31397.9%2511443952,01632381,013267ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Ilurir (Eliberi, Elvira, Granada)
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 34, to Page 36
  • Titular See of Granada
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 160, and Page 161
  • Archdiocese of Granada
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 161
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204, and Page 205
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 196
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 211
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 228
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 50, Page 44, and Page 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 6 Jun 2024