Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amancio Escapa Aparicio, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Titular Bishop of Cenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1938Born
2 Aug 195416.3Simple VowsMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
4 Apr 195921.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
22 Apr 196224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
31 May 199658.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
31 May 199658.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenae
6 Jul 199658.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cenae
4 Jul 201678.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
5 May 201779.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Amancio Escapa Aparicio
Bishop Amancio Escapa Aparicio O.C.D. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCistierna, Spain
Death PlaceSanto Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,769
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2016
  • d/c1: CB, 5 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017