Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ricardo Pittini Piussi, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo

Bishop of Dominican Republic, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1876BornTricesimo, Italy
22 Jan 189922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Oct 193559.4AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
8 Dec 193559.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
195881.7AppointedBishop of Dominican Republic, Military
10 Dec 196185.6DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Pittini Piussi:
Archbishop Ricardo Pittini Piussi S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013