Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro de Oviedo Falconi, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Jan 1621AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
14 May 1628SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Quito, Ecuador
10 Jul 1628ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Quito, Ecuador
14 Jun 1645SelectedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
21 Aug 1645ConfirmedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
13 Oct 1649DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Oviedo Falconi
Archbishop Pedro de Oviedo Falconi O. Cist. (died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcalá de Henares, Spain

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 290, and Page 176
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 282
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 141, Number 898
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast