Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Félix Pepén y Soliman

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey

Titular Bishop of Arpi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1920BornHigüey
29 Jun 194727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
1 Apr 195939.2AppointedBishop of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic
31 May 195939.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic
10 May 197555.3ResignedBishop of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic
10 May 197555.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
10 May 197555.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arpi
11 Feb 199575.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
21 Jul 200787.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Juan Félix Pepén y Soliman:
Bishop Juan Félix Pepén y Soliman (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 48.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+/d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 48
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 31 Oct 2013