Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Yucatán

Archidioecesis Yucatanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 November 1906
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Yucatán
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 39,430 (15,229 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sureste
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesisdeyucatan.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Calle 58 N. 501, 97000 Mérida, Yuc., México
  • Telephone: (999)924-77-77
  • Fax: 923-79-83

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Yucatán (Mérida)
19 November 1561ErectedDiocese of Yucatán (Mérida) (erected)
25 May 1880Territory LostDiocese of Yucatán (Mérida) Diocese of Tabasco (erected)
23 June 1891Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Yucatán (Mérida) (From Mexico (Mexico) to Antequera, Oaxaca (Mexico))
24 March 1895Territory LostDiocese of Yucatán (Mérida) Diocese of Campeche (erected)
Archdiocese of Yucatán
11 November 1906ElevatedDiocese of Yucatán (Mérida) Archdiocese of Yucatán
23 May 1970Territory LostArchdiocese of Yucatán Territorial Prelature of Chetumal (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Yucatán
1950407,500108,000377.3%7312854,794187533ap1951
1965637,000700,00091.0%118321504,2465922559ap1967
1970690,000756,68691.2%121261474,6934026571ap1971
1976920,0001,005,90591.5%129271565,8974422472ap1977
1980991,0001,024,00096.8%123251486,69513826082ap1981
19901,334,8711,570,43785.0%140311717,80655727387ap1991
19991,438,9851,637,91187.9%158411997,231125834091ap2000
20001,407,4591,645,00085.6%159452046,899165841292ap2001
20011,467,4591,655,70788.6%156431997,374169039395ap2002
20021,517,2521,720,82588.2%155452007,586168050595ap2003
20031,521,9371,785,05485.3%168442127,178181127795ap2004
20041,609,0601,838,60587.5%169502197,3472479520100ap2005
20101,743,0001,990,00087.6%161492108,30032109487103ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014