Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Antonio Gallego Gorgojo, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo

Titular Bishop of Arcadia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1892BornVillaquejida, Spain
15 Jul 190917.3ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
29 Jul 192533.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 May 194553.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
2 May 194553.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadia
12 Aug 194553.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcadia
195158.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
18 Apr 195967.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Felipe Antonio Gallego Gorgojo:
Bishop Felipe Antonio Gallego Gorgojo S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013