Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando de Carvajal y Ribera (Rivera), O. de M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹BornSalamanca, Spain
3 Mar 168755.2AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
18 May 168755.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
Dec 1700²68.9ResignedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
24 Apr 170169.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Carvajal y Ribera (Rivera):
Archbishop Fernando de Carvajal y Ribera (Rivera) O. de M. (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo

  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 187
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 229, Number 1,425
  • ob: CB, 23 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Sep 2014