Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando de Vera y Zuñiga, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1568²Born
17 Feb 161446.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Badajoz, Spain
17 Feb 161446.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bugia
13 Nov 162860.8AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
8 Mar 162961.1SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cuzco, Peru
16 Jul 162961.5ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cuzco, Peru
9 Nov 163870.8DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Vera y Zuñiga
Archbishop Fernando de Vera y Zuñiga O.S.A. (born 1568, died ) Bishop of Cuzco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMérida, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 123, and Page 176
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 170
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 131, Number 835
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast