Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de Escalante Turcios y Mendoza

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹BornAndalucía
23 Oct 167264.8SelectedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
27 Feb 167365.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
29 Dec 167971.9SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Yucatán (Mérida), México
29 Apr 168072.3ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Yucatán (Mérida), México
31 May 168173.4DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Escalante Turcios y Mendoza:
Archbishop Juan de Escalante Turcios y Mendoza (died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 186, and Page 420
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015