Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego de Contreras, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹BornMéxico
18 Jun 161250.5AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
10 Nov 161351.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
24 Apr 161856.3DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Contreras:
Archbishop Diego de Contreras O.S.A. (died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c24: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,894
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Aug 2014