Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Castro Marte

Bishop of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1966 Born
13 Jun 199529.2Ordained PriestPriest of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
1 Jul 201751.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
1 Jul 201751.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Giufi
26 Aug 201751.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giufi
30 May 202054.1AppointedBishop of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic
28 Jul 202054.3InstalledBishop of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Jesús Castro Marte
Bishop Jesús Castro Marte (born ) Bishop of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuerra, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo
Ordained BishopCentro de Convenciones Sansoucí, Santo Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Jul 2017
  • c34: CB, 26 Aug 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,507
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 May 2020
  • i: CB, 2 Jun 2020
  • i: CB, 23 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast