Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Valera y Jiménez

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1758Born
5 Apr 178122.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 181758.7AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
15 Feb 181859.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
19 Mar 183374.6DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Pedro Valera y Jiménez
Archbishop Pedro Valera y Jiménez (born , died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanto Domingo

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 178
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,145
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast