Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of León en Nicaragua

Dioecesis Leonensis in Nicaragua



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 2 December 1913
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Managua
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nicaragua
  • Square Kilometers: 9,862 (3,809 Square Miles)
  • Description: León and Chinandega
  • Mailing Address: Apartado 86, León, Nicaragua
  • Telephone: (0311)4820
  • Fax: 1132

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Nicaragua
3 November 1534ErectedDiocese of Panamá Diocese of Nicaragua (erected)
11 February 1547Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Nicaragua (From Seville (Spain) to Lima (Peru))
16 December 1743Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Nicaragua (From Lima (Peru) to Guatemala)
28 February 1850Territory LostDiocese of Nicaragua Diocese of San José de Costa Rica (erected) (Costa Rica)
2 December 1913Territory LostDiocese of Nicaragua Diocese of Granada (erected)
2 December 1913Territory LostDiocese of Nicaragua Archdiocese of Managua (erected)
2 December 1913Territory LostDiocese of Nicaragua Vicariate Apostolic of Bluefields (erected)
2 December 1913Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Nicaragua (From Guatemala)
Diocese of León en Nicaragua
2 December 1913Name ChangedDiocese of Nicaragua Diocese of León en Nicaragua
17 December 1962Territory LostDiocese of León en Nicaragua Diocese of Esteli (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of León en Nicaragua
1950318,285327,97497.0%3926654,896268351ap1951
1966187,252187,37299.9%2424483,901356623ap1967
1968274,720278,67598.6%2720475,845326618ap1971
1976332,700390,00085.3%2218408,317354632ap1977
1999619,082728,33285.0%5311649,6732209041ap2000
2000629,000739,00085.1%49116010,4834209041ap2001
2001667,000784,31885.0%55116610,1062209343ap2002
2002673,000791,00085.1%5812709,6142219643ap2003
2003667,000784,31885.0%5913729,2634229647ap2004
2004667,000784,31885.0%5911709,5284209647ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 15 Dec 2013