Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hugo Eduardo Polanco Brito

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1918BornSan Juan Evangelista de Salcedo
25 Jun 194425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
25 Sep 195334.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
25 Sep 195334.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Centenaria
31 Jan 195435.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centenaria
22 Jul 195637.8AppointedBishop of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
14 Mar 196647.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
14 Mar 196647.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Germania
14 Mar 196647.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Dominican Republic, Military
20 Jan 197051.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
20 Jan 197051.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mentesa
10 May 197556.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic
25 Mar 199576.4RetiredBishop of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic
13 Apr 199677.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Hugo Eduardo Polanco Brito:
Archbishop Hugo Eduardo Polanco Brito (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1995, Page 480
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1970, Page 435, and Page 674

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 Sep 2014