Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elías Rodríguez Ortiz

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Titular Archbishop of Flaviopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1802¹Born
19 Mar 185755.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
19 Mar 185755.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Flaviopolis
14 Jun 185755.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Flaviopolis
29 Nov 185755.9DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Elías Rodríguez Ortiz
Archbishop Elías Rodríguez Ortiz (born 1802, died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanto Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santo Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 248, and Page 272
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 30
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,752
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,548

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 9 Aug 2020

Quantcast