Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Les Cayes

Dioecesis Caiesensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Chibly Langlois, Cardinal, Bishop
  • Jean Alix Verrier, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 3 October 1861
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Haïti
  • Square Kilometers: 2,817 (1,088 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Évêché, B.P. 43, 137 rue Antoine Simon et Toussaint Louverture, HT-8110 Les Cayes, Haïti
  • Telephone: 2270-1444; 2270-2018; 3649-1203

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3 October 1861ErectedArchdiocese of Santo Domingo Diocese of Cap-Haïtien (erected)
Diocese of Les Cayes (erected)
Diocese of Les Gonaïves (erected)
Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince (erected)
Diocese of Port-de-Paix (erected)
20 April 1972Territory LostDiocese of Les Cayes Diocese of Jérémie (erected)
13 July 2008Territory LostDiocese of Les Cayes Diocese of Anse-à-Veau et Miragoâne (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1949750,000775,00096.8%5440947,9784411235ap1951
1966906,000930,00097.4%78431217,4873216752ap1967
1970910,0001,050,00086.7%56471038,8344713853ap1971
1976700,000800,00087.5%4035759,3336013238ap1977
1980764,0001,063,00071.9%31386911,0726313938ap1981
19901,014,0001,455,50069.7%41468711,6556914539ap1991
19971,000,0001,500,00066.7%45236814,7054914543ap2000
20001,000,0001,500,00066.7%47237014,2854914543ap2001
2001933,0001,400,00066.6%55288311,2405513643ap2004
2013577,000870,00066.3%77391164,97417211756ap2014
2016472,000712,20066.3%74391134,1761629756ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.6, 14 Jan 2019; Data: 17 Feb 2019

Quantcast