Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastián Ramírez de Fuenleal (Arellano)

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1490¹BornVillaescusa de Haro, Spain
23 Dec 152839.0AppointedBishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
Aug 1529³39.6Ordained BishopBishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
29 Jul 153848.6AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
29 Oct 153949.8AppointedBishop of León, Spain
2 Jun 154252.4AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
22 Jan 154757.1DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastián Ramírez de Fuenleal (Arellano):
Bishop Sebastián Ramírez de Fuenleal (Arellano) (died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 41, Number 204
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 320, and Page 221
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 174, and Page 187

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Nov 2013