Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Freddy Antonio de Jesús Bretón Martínez

Archbishop of Santiago de los Caballeros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1947 BornLicey
10 Sep 197729.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
6 Aug 199850.8AppointedBishop of Baní, Dominican Republic
19 Sep 199850.9Ordained BishopBishop of Baní, Dominican Republic
23 Feb 201567.3AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
18 Apr 201567.5InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Freddy Antonio de Jesús Bretón Martínez:
Archbishop Freddy Antonio de Jesús Bretón Martínez (born ) Archbishop of Santiago de los Caballeros

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de los Caballeros.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,429
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2015
  • i: CB, 27 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 28 Feb 2015