Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cristóbal Rodríguez Juárez (Suárez), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1547²BornSalamanca, Spain
2 Jun 160861.4AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
16 Jan 161265.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Arequipa, Peru
4 Nov 161366.8DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal Rodríguez Juárez (Suárez):
Archbishop Cristóbal Rodríguez Juárez (Suárez) O.P. (born 1547, died ) Bishop of Arequipa

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 93, and Page 176
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 125, Number 796
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1608, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015