Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Santiago de los Caballeros

Archidioecesis Sancti Iacobi Equitum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 February 1994
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Dominican Republic
  • Square Kilometers: 3,633 (1,403 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Calle Duvergé 14, Santiago de los Caballeros, República Dominicana
  • Telephone: (809)582-2094
  • Fax: 581-3580

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Santiago de los Caballeros
25 September 1953ErectedArchdiocese of Santo Domingo Diocese of Santiago de los Caballeros (erected)
16 January 1978Territory LostDiocese of Santiago de los Caballeros Diocese of Mao-Monte Cristi (erected)
16 January 1978Territory LostDiocese of La Vega
Diocese of Santiago de los Caballeros
Diocese of San Francisco de Macorís (erected)
Archdiocese of Santiago de los Caballeros
14 February 1994ElevatedDiocese of Santiago de los Caballeros Archdiocese of Santiago de los Caballeros
16 December 1996Territory LostArchdiocese of Santiago de los Caballeros Diocese of Puerto Plata (erected)
1 February 1997Territory LostDiocese of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey
Archdiocese of Santiago de los Caballeros
Diocese of San Pedro de Macorís (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Santiago de los Caballeros
1964872,928882,92898.9%3361949,2867225332ap1967
19701,025,4521,047,68397.9%28598711,7867631237ap1971
19761,184,0001,209,63197.9%406710711,065711927044ap1977
1980853,046877,93397.2%38377511,373207024230ap1981
1990932,2001,100,43284.7%43438610,839595014936ap1991
Archdiocese of Santiago de los Caballeros
1999789,000876,75390.0%4447918,67074567966ap2000
2000789,000876,75390.0%42337510,520103427970ap2001
2001789,000920,00085.8%5444988,05196639779ap2002
2002789,000966,00081.7%5429839,506974610982ap2003
2003662,000810,46281.7%5439937,118100528686ap2004
2004870,6351,065,88681.7%5243959,1641096315386ap2005
20101,064,0001,270,00083.8%77491268,44410613426887ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 Sep 2014