Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Moreno Curiel, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1695Born
12 Apr 175357.4SelectedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
28 May 175357.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
27 Nov 175560.1DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for José Moreno Curiel
Archbishop José Moreno Curiel O.SS.T. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTalavera de la Reina

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 199
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast