Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Andrés de Carvajal, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jun 1568AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
10 May 1570AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
28 Aug 1577DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Francisco Andrés de Carvajal
Archbishop Francisco Andrés de Carvajal O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcántara, Diocese of Plasencia, Spain
Death PlaceSanto Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 79, Number 473
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 278, and Page 187
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast