Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Cuyck

Deceased

Bishop of Lige, Belgium


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Sep 1191AppointedBishop of Lige, Belgium
23 Nov 1192ResignedBishop-Elect of Lige, Belgium
18 Sep 1194AppointedBishop of Lige, Belgium
Jan 1196³Ordained BishopBishop of Lige, Belgium
1 Feb 1200DiedBishop of Lige, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Albert Cuyck
Bishop Albert Cuyck (died ) Bishop of Lige

EventPlace
Ordained BishopKln, Archdiocese of Kln {Cologne}, Germany

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 249
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 301
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast