Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Arnold Barrett

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1770³BornLooz
23 Feb 179323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
15 Apr 183363.1AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
16 Jun 183363.3Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
31 Jul 183565.4DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Arnold Barrett:
Bishop Jean Arnold Barrett (born , died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 275
  • ob/c2+: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014