Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Heinsberg

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Liège, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1393¹Born
20 Sep 141926.7AppointedBishop of Liège, Belgium
17 Mar 142027.2Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
22 Oct 145562.8ResignedBishop of Liège, Belgium
18 Oct 145966.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Heinsberg
Bishop Jean de Heinsberg (born 1393, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Liège

  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 302
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,830

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast