Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean d’Eppé de Rumigny

Deceased

Bishop of Liège, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1188¹Born
17 Apr 122941.2AppointedBishop of Liège, Belgium
23 Mar 123042.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 123042.2Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
1 May 123850.3DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Eppé de Rumigny
Bishop Jean d’Eppé de Rumigny (born 1188, died ) Bishop of Liège

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Théodard, Church, Thuin
Death PlaceChâteau, Dinant

  • a priest for 8.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 301
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,075
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,034
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,712

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast