Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Walenrode

Deceased

Bishop of Liège, Belgium


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Sep 1393AppointedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
30 May 1418AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Liège, Belgium
28 May 1419DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Johann Walenrode
Archbishop Johann Walenrode (died ) Bishop of Liège

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 421, and Page 302

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast