Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Engelbert von der Mark

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1304¹Born
25 Feb 134541.1AppointedBishop of Liège, Belgium
15 Apr 136460.2AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
26 Aug 136864.6DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Engelbert von der Mark (VIAF: 38905925)
Archbishop Engelbert von der Mark (born 1304, died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 198, and Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast