Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Antoine de Grady

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1712³BornLiege
24 Mar 174229.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Liège, Belgium
19 May 174229.4Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
22 Nov 176249.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
22 Nov 176249.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
21 Dec 176250.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
9 Jul 176754.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Antoine de Grady:
Bishop Charles Antoine de Grady (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

  • a priest for 25.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 336, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015