Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Wijnants, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mbandaka-Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1914Born
6 Aug 193925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
21 Apr 196450.2AppointedArchbishop of Coquilhatville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Jun 196450.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Coquilhatville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Nov 197763.7ResignedArchbishop of Mbandaka-Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
22 Aug 197864.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mbandaka-Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Pierre Wijnants
Archbishop Pierre Wijnants M.S.C. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mbandaka-Bikoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorlo, Belgium

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast