Catholic-Hierarchy DC

St. Albert Cardinal de Louvain

Deceased

Bishop of Liège


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1166¹BornLouvain
8 Sep 119125.6AppointedBishop of Liège, Belgium
May 119226.3Elevated to Cardinal
30 May 119226.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Sep 119226.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 119226.7Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
24 Nov 119226.8DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium
9 Aug 1613Canonized

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Albert de Louvain:
St. Albert Cardinal de Louvain (died ) Bishop of Liège

  • a priest for .1 years
  • a bishop for .1 years
  • a cardinal for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,573
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015