Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jozef Vanderhoven, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Boma

Titular Bishop of Sinna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1888BornLiège, Belgium
14 Sep 191324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
26 Feb 193445.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Boma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Feb 193445.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinna
1 May 193445.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinna
4 Dec 194961.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Boma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Jozef Vanderhoven:
Bishop Jozef Vanderhoven C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Boma

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013