Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Strecheus

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Dionysias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1580³Born
6 Oct 161434.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
6 Oct 161434.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
8 Mar 161535.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
6 Mar 162848.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stephen Strecheus
Bishop Stephen Strecheus (born Jan 1580, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiège

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 175
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast