Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloys Jousten

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1937Born
8 Jul 196224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium
9 May 200163.5AppointedBishop of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium
3 Jun 200163.5Ordained BishopBishop of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium
31 May 201375.5RetiredBishop of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium
20 Sep 202183.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium

MicroData Summary for Aloys Jousten
Bishop Aloys Jousten (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Liège (Luik, Lüttich)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Vith
Ordained BishopSaint Paul, Cathedral, Liège, Diocese of Liège (Luik, Lüttich)
Death PlaceKöln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,986
  • r: Bollettino, 31 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 22 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Sep 2021

Quantcast