Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petrus Canisius Jean van Lierde, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1907BornHasselt, Belgium
30 May 193124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
13 Jan 195143.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
13 Jan 195143.7AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
25 Feb 195143.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
14 Jan 199183.7RetiredOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
12 Mar 199587.9DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Petrus Canisius Jean van Lierde:
Bishop Petrus Canisius Jean van Lierde O.S.A. (born , died ) Official Emeritus of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013