Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Erhard (Erardo, Everard) Cardinal von der Mark (de la Marca, Marck)

Deceased

Bishop of Liège, Belgium

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono

Administrator of Valencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1472Born
25 Feb 150633.7AppointedBishop of Liège, Belgium
13 May 150633.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 150633.9Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
5 Nov 150735.4AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
28 Mar 152047.8AppointedAdministrator of Valencia, Spain
25 Jun 152048.0InstalledAdministrator of Valencia, Spain
9 Aug 152048.1Elevated to Cardinal
5 Jan 152148.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
29 Mar 152552.8ResignedBishop of Chartres, France
27 Feb 153865.7DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Erhard (Erardo, Everard) von der Mark (de la Marca, Marck) (VIAF: 20477461)
Erhard (Erardo, Everard) Cardinal von der Mark (de la Marca, Marck) (born , died ) Bishop of Liège

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSedan, Germany
Ordained BishopCanons Regular, Church, Tongres
Death PlaceLiège, Diocese of Liège

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
  • a cardinal for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Aug 1520
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,454
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 23, Number 46
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1506, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 31 May 2018

Quantcast