Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roger Pirenne, C.I.C.M.

Archbishop Emeritus of Bertoua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1934 BornClermont sur Berwinne, Belgium
3 Aug 195824.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 199459.5AppointedBishop of Batouri, Cameroon
22 May 199459.8Ordained BishopBishop of Batouri, Cameroon
3 Jun 199964.8AppointedArchbishop of Bertoua, Cameroon
3 Dec 200975.3RetiredArchbishop of Bertoua, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Roger Pirenne:
Archbishop Roger Pirenne C.I.C.M. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bertoua

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bertoua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013