Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert de Berghes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Liège, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530¹Born
25 Jun 155424.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Liège, Belgium
5 May 155727.3SucceededBishop of Liège, Belgium
28 Nov 155727.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Nov 155727.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 155727.9Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
22 Jul 156333.5ResignedBishop of Liège, Belgium
26 Jan 158555.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert de Berghes
Bishop Robert de Berghes (born 1530, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Liège

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAbbey, Heckenrode

  • a priest for 27.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1557, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 222
  • c4/od/op: CB, 14 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast