Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas de Grace

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

Titular Bishop of Dionysias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹BornGrace
22 Sep 160723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
11 Dec 162844.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
11 Dec 162844.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
1629²45.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
4 Aug 163652.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas de Grace:
Bishop Thomas de Grace (born 1584, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 175
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015