Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Antoine Marie Constantin de Méan et de Beaurieux

Deceased

Archbishop of Mechelen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1756³BornSaive
14 Aug 178529.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Liège, Belgium
17 Sep 178529.1Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
19 Dec 178529.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
19 Dec 178529.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
19 Feb 178629.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
16 Aug 179236.1SelectedBishop of Liège, Belgium
24 Sep 179236.2ConfirmedBishop of Liège, Belgium
26 Nov 180145.3ResignedBishop of Liège, Belgium
28 Jul 181761.0AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
15 Jan 183174.5DiedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Antoine Marie Constantin de Méan et de Beaurieux
Archbishop François Antoine Marie Constantin de Méan et de Beaurieux (born , died ) Archbishop of Mechelen

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 259
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 236, and Page 258
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Aug 2016