Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Corneille Van Berghen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Liège, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1490¹Born
9 Feb 153040.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Liège, Belgium
27 Feb 153848.1SucceededBishop of Liège, Belgium
16 Aug 154454.6ResignedBishop of Liège, Belgium
1560¹70.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Corneille Van Berghen
Bishop Corneille Van Berghen (born 1490, died 1560) Bishop Emeritus of Liège

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 222
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1530, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast